RI S0758 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth new renewable energy standards.
Title
Renewable Energy Standard
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2021) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0758.pdf |