RI S0755 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts those students in grade twelve (12) who are enrolled full-time in a dual enrollment program where the courses are taken on a higher education institution campus from the requirement that they complete health and physical education courses.
Title
Curriculum [see Title 16 Chapter 97 - The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2019) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |