RI S0753 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from state taxation certain pension benefits that originate from, and were taxed in another state.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2021) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0753.pdf |