RI S0745 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Certificate PC for public institutions of higher learning to employ CB journey person electricians for minor electrical work on their premises.
Title
Electricians
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-26 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-20 | House | Meeting postponed (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/25/2021) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2021) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2021) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |