RI S0745 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the executive office of health and human services (EOHHS) to conduct a study to assess the impact of using Medicaid funds to provide coverage for the treatment of the chronically homeless.
Title
Rhode Island Pathways Project
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |