RI S0740 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes changes to the licensing procedures for health care facilities.
Title
Inspections Of Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Health care facilities (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Health care facilities (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-07-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-05-31 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2017) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2017) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |