RI S0738 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island health insurance market stability and consumer protection act in order to update state law to reflect current insurance standards, practice and regulation to maintain market stability.
Title
Health Insurance Coverage--market Stability And Consumer Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/16/2019) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2019) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2019) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |