RI S0737 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the general laws relative to regulation of freshwater wetlands by establishing state standards for freshwater buffers and setbacks.
Title
Agriculture Functions Of Department Of Environmental Management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Agriculture functions of dem approval of amendment lc 002156/2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Agriculture functions of dem approval of amendment lc 002156/2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-24 | House | House passed Sub B |
2015-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2015-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2015) |
2015-06-19 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2015) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2015) |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2015) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |