RI S0724 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the Judiciary's Indirect Cost Recovery/Supreme Court, Victims' Rights Information, RI Supreme Court Disciplinary Counsel and Small Claims Mediation accounts to the list of restricted receipt accounts which are not subject to indirect cost recovery.
Title
State Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2021) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |