RI S0722 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Meeting postponed (05/20/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Meeting postponed (05/20/2021)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows recovery of damages for the emotional distress, grief, and loss of enjoyment of life as a result of the wrongful death of a spouse, a parent or a son or daughter.
Title
Procedure In Particular Actions - Death By Wrongful Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/20/2021) |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0722.pdf |