RI S0719 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-22 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-22 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Excludes weekends/state holidays from the 48 hour calculation of public notices and requires audio recordings of all open/closed meetings of public bodies.
Title
Open Meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Open meetings approval of amendment lc 001875/3 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2015) |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2015) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |