RI S0714 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the workforce board to fund a non-trade apprenticeship incentive program in fisheries.
Title
Governor's Workforce Board Rhode Island
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] |
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/14/2019) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/08/2019) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |