RI S0712 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifies the rights and options of government employees who decide not to join their employer's exclusive bargaining unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Union Representation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateSigned by Governor
2019-07-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-27HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-26HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/27/2019)
2019-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2019-06-20HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/26/2019)
2019-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar
2019-06-14HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2019)
2019-06-12HouseReferred to House Labor
2019-06-11SenateSenate passed Sub A
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/11/2019)
2019-05-29SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-05-24SenateScheduled for consideration (05/29/2019)
2019-05-01SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2019-05-01SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2019-04-30SenateProposed Substitute
2019-04-26SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019)
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback