RI S0712 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Long-term Economic Development Vision And Policy (would Establish A 19 Member Economic Development Planning Council To Develop A Written Long-term Economic Development Vision And Policy And Strategic Implementation Plan.)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Long-term Economic Development Vision And Policy (would Establish A 19 Member Economic Development Planning Council To Develop A Written Long-term Economic Development Vision And Policy And Strategic Implementation Plan.)
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-07-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-02 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-07-01 | House | Scheduled for consideration (07/02/2013) |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate passed as amended |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/11/2013) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2013) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |