RI S0710 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all health insurance providers offering prescription drug benefits to limit person’s out-of-pocket costs to$100 for 30 day supply. Commencing 1/1/22.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2021) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0710.pdf |