RI S0709 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes sweeping changes to the motor vehicles laws by repealing the many sections that require the filing of security or bond with the DMV following a motor vehicle accident.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safety Responsibility Administration -- Security

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-30SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2019)
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback