RI S0701 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that one third of all Rhode Island teachers, for the next three (3) years trained in the basic emergency and response skills curriculum ("BEARS"), specifically in hand-only cardiopulmonary resuscitation, Heimlich maneuver, and bleeding control.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2021) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0701.pdf |