RI S0700 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers the expulsion power of members to credit union management from the board of directors, provides written notice to the member of expulsion, and establishes a ten (10) business day appeal procedure to the board of directors.
Title
Relating To Financial Institutions--credit Unions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-14 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-05-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017) |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2017) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |