RI S0691 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Assisted Living Residence Licensing Act
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Assisted Living Residence Licensing Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] |
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-02 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-07-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2013) |
2013-06-22 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2013) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2013) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/11/2013) |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Substitute A |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2013) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Committee continued |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2013) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |