RI S0688 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increases temporary caregiver benefits to six (6) weeks in a benefit year starting January 1, 2022 and would increase temporary caregiver benefits to eight (8) weeks in a benefit year beginning January 1, 2023.
Title
Temporary Disability Insurance -- Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-25 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/25/2021) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2021) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |