RI S0679 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Rhode Island residents who work for an out-of-state nongovernmental employer to apply for coverage under Rhode Island's Temporary Disability Insurance program.
Title
Temporary Disability Insurance - Coverage
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0679.pdf |