RI S0677 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Replaces the American Arbitration Association, as the selector of labor arbitrators, in non-grievance contract matters, with the director of the department of labor and training.
Title
Relating To Labor And Labor Relations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0677.pdf |