RI S0673 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the emergency police power rules to include other municipal police officers as being subject to the authority of the requesting police chief and permits campus police and municipal departments to enter into mutual aid agreements.
Title
Emergency Police Power
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Senate | Committee continued |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2015) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2015) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/24/2015) |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/SenateText15/S0673.pdf |