RI S0671 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations To Protect Our Environment And Natural Resources From Plastic Bottle Waste (creates An 18 Member Special Joint Legislative Commission Whose Purpose It Would Be To Study And Provide Recommendations To Protect Our Environment From Plastic Bottle Waste/report Back To The General Assembly No Later Than 6/10/24 And Expire On 6/30/24.)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations To Protect Our Environment And Natural Resources From Plastic Bottle Waste (creates An 18 Member Special Joint Legislative Commission Whose Purpose It Would Be To Study And Provide Recommendations To Protect Our Environment From Plastic Bottle Waste/report Back To The General Assembly No Later Than 6/10/24 And Expire On 6/30/24.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-15 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2023-06-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2023) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/08/2023) |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2023) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |