RI S0670 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits any state agency, department or person which is authorized to expend or collect money for the state, from many types of discrimination.
Title
State Contracts Anti-discrimination
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0670.pdf |