RI S0667 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines any act of sexual penetration or contact perpetrated by an individual with a position of authority upon a person over the age of fourteen (14) and under the age of eighteen (18) as third degree sexual assault.
Title
Sexual Assaults
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0667.pdf |