RI S0664 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts the Born-Alive Infant Protection Act and provides for the duties and obligations of medical personnel in certain circumstances.
Title
Born-alive Infant Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0664.pdf |