RI S0662 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires employers in the state with more than 50 employees to display a poster containing basic information on veterans' benefits and services which would be created and distributed by the DLT in consultation with the office of veterans services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Posting Of Veterans' Benefits And Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-17SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-05-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2023)
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback