RI S0662 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a fee on companies that sell fossil fuels in Rhode Island for consumption or distribution within the state and establishes an "economic and climate resilience fund" to disburse the collected funds.
Title
Economic And Climate Resilience Act Of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0662.pdf |