RI S0661 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires employer provide employee with written quota descriptions/number of task/item production along with potential adverse employment action for failure to meet quotas/ provides employee protection against quotas/ remedies for violations.
Title
Warehouse Worker Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Robert Britto [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2023) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0661.pdf |