RI S0660 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain public works renovation projects that include glazing work would have that work performed by North American contractor certification certified companies.
Title
State Purchases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-12 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2023-06-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2023) |
2023-06-08 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2023-06-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2023) |
2023-06-02 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2023) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2023) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2023) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |