RI S0659 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting An Assessment Of The Benefits To Rhode Island Of Enactment Of A Green New Deal, Including, But Not Limited To, Findings And Recommendations For State Legislation Based On Green New Deal Principles.
Title
Senate Resolution Respectfully Requesting An Assessment Of The Benefits To Rhode Island Of Enactment Of A Green New Deal, Including, But Not Limited To, Findings And Recommendations For State Legislation Based On Green New Deal Principles.
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0659.pdf |