RI S0658 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises appraisal threshold for auto insurance from $2,500 to $5,000, requires an insurance company to complete the appraisal within four days and redefines fair market value to include commonly used insurance industry compilations.
Title
Unfair Claims Settlement Practices Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0658.pdf |