RI S0648 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds medical directors to those individuals to whom disclosure of information contained in any prescription-drug-database is allowed.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2021) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |