RI S0645 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health care facilities that perform abortions to meet the license requirements of similar health care facilities and allows the department of health to conduct unannounced inspections.
Title
Yearly Inspections Of Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0645.pdf |