RI S0645 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires movie theaters to provide open captioning for persons who are deaf or hard-of-hearing.
Title
Equal Rights Of Blind And Deaf Persons To Public Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0645.pdf |