RI S0641 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows those individuals who pay part or all of the cost of a renewable energy system to carry over the tax credit, if not used for the year of installation, to the next year for a maximum of three (3) years.
Title
Residential Renewable Energy System Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2017) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0641.pdf |