RI S0640 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Rhode Island secure choice retirement savings program. Establishes a board which is a public corporation. Allows for creation of IRA-type retirement investments managed by the board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-05-07SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2021)
2021-04-05SenateMeeting postponed (04/05/2021)
2021-04-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2021-03-18SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback