RI S0623 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Decreases the amount of the reinstatement fees for a motor vehicle registration or certificate of title which was revoked, denied or suspended and reduced reinstatement fees for suspension or revocation of registration or certificate of title.
Title
Offenses Against Registration And Certificate Of Title Laws
Sponsors
Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Matthew LaMountain [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2023) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0623.pdf |