RI S0618 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Simplifies process for foreign corporations to obtain certificate of authority by producing only certificate of good standing legal assistance from incorporating state or country.
Title
Rhode Island Nonprofit Corporation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-14 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-05-30 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/30/2017) |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/02/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2017) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |