RI S0614 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all CASA (court-appointed special advocate) volunteers to first pass DCYF clearance as well as a national criminal background check before qualifying for appointment by the court.
Title
Abused And Neglected Children
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2017) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2017) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |