RI S0612 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires an employer to provide employees with additional paid sick leave time, in addition to paid sick and safe leave time, for COVID-19 purposes.
Title
Healthy And Safe Families And Workplaces Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] |
Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2021) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0612.pdf |