RI S0609 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows jurors to donate their juror fees to the state. Any such donation would be deposited into the general fund.
Title
Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-29 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/25/2021) |
2021-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-16 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2021) |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2021) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/13/2021) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2021) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |