RI S0608 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution -- Of Suffrage (would Propose To The Voters Of The State A Constitutional Amendment Regarding Eligibility To Vote And To Be A Candidate.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution -- Of Suffrage (would Propose To The Voters Of The State A Constitutional Amendment Regarding Eligibility To Vote And To Be A Candidate.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-04SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-31SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2023)
2023-03-07SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback