RI S0608 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Committee continued
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets the daily pay for election supervisors at fifteen dollars ($15.00) per hour.
Title
Voting Districts And Officials--poll Worker Compensation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee continued |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2021) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2021) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0608.pdf |