RI S0604 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases penalties for driving to endanger, resulting in death and resulting in bodily injury and amends the penalty range for driving under the influence resulting in death or bodily injury.
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2017) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/23/2017) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0604.pdf |