RI S0602 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes licensed auto body shops to sell or dispose of motor vehicles that have been abandoned and located on their premises.
Title
Related To Motor And Other Vehicles -- Abandoned Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2021) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0602.pdf |