RI S0602 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that when an agency publicly proposes for notice and comment or otherwise promulgates a new rule or regulation, it would identify at least one existing rule or regulation to be repealed.
Title
Administrative Procedures Act
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/SenateText17/S0602.pdf |