RI S0600 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the juror's fees for each day's attendance on the superior court from $15.00 per day to $25.00 per day commencing July 1, 2022, and increases to $35.00 per day commencing July 1, 2023, and thereafter.
Title
Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-25 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/11/2021) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2021) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |