RI S0599 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-29 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-29 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Finance: would require state departmental agencies which fail to achieve performance standards in the prior fiscal year to outline and submit to the governor steps to be taken to meet performance standards in the next fiscal year
Title
An Act Relating To Public Finance
Sponsors
Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] | Sen. Michael Pinga [D] |
Sen. James Sheehan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Referred to House Finance | |
2011-06-28 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-06-27 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-27 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-24 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-05-24 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-19 | Committee heard | |
2011-05-19 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0599.pdf |